This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 05/05/2020 at 09:20:59 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, CELIA VS WILLIAMS, TANGELA

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 WILLIAMS, CELIA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WILLIAMS, TANGELA. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAKAC, MICHAEL G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAKAC, MICHAEL G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, CELIA

Respondent

WILLIAMS, TANGELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/17/2019

HearingEvent Type: IO - INJUNCTION HEARING - CIVIL - OSH; Location: TAVARES; Room: MGT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2019

DocketDescription: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Text: Disposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2019

DocketDescription: ORDER DISSOLVING OR DECLINING TO ENTER INJUNCTION; Text: AFTER TESTIMONY; COPY MAILED TO PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2019

DocketDescription: INJUNCTION COURT SHEET -; Text: BOTH PARTIES WERE PRESENT AT 12/17/19 HEARING; INJUNCTION DENIED AFTER TESTIMONY BY PETITIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2019

DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED -; Text: RE: HRG 12/17/19 - ORDER SETTING HRG ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION RETURNED BY LCSO AS SERVED BY INDIVIDUAL SERVICE TO RESPONDENT 12/05/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2019

DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED -; Text: RE: HEARING DATE 12/17/19 - ORDER SETTING HEARING SERVED TO TANGELA WILLIAMS INDIVIDUALLY ON 12/05/19 BY LCSO (SERVED IN INJUNCTION OFFICE BY BAILIFF)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2019

DocketDescription: SET ON IO - INJUNCTION HEARING - CIVIL - OSH DOCKET 12/17/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM TAKAC, MICHAEL G; Text: IO - INJUNCTION HEARING - CIVIL - OSH 12/17/2019 9:00 AM TAKAC, MICHAEL G

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2019

DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION WITHOUT ISSUANCE OF AN INTERIM TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Text: HEARING SET FOR TUESDAY, DECEMBER 17, 2019 AT 9:00 AM; COPIES TO PETITIONER BY MAIL; COPIES FOR SERVICE TO LCSO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2019

DocketDescription: SHERIFF'S INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2019

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less