This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/19/2020 at 07:33:13 (UTC).

WHITE PETERKIN, ANDRIE VS ROBINSON, BERNADINE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 WHITE PETERKIN, ANDRIE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ROBINSON, BERNADINE. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE PETERKIN, ANDRIE

Defendants

ROBINSON, BOBBY

ROBINSON, BERNADINE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT; FOR EVICTION

02/05/2019 COMPLAINT; FOR EVICTION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION - COUNT I

03/08/2019 MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION - COUNT I

 

Docket Entries

03/19/2019

DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED; Text: EXECUTED 03/15/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2019

DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; Text: LCSO (03.13.19-AM)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2019

DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION; Text: AS TO BOBBY ROBINSON AND BERNADINE ROBINSON // SIGNED 03.12.19; Book: 5247; Page: 2137

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2019

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION - COUNT I/ DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ROBINSON, BOBBY,ROBINSON, BERNADINE; Text: ROBINSON, BOBBY,ROBINSON, BERNADINE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION - COUNT I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2019

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2019

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO ROBINSON, BERNADINE / 02/07/2019; Text: ROBINSON, BERNADINE 02/07/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2019

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO ROBINSON, BOBBY / 02/07/2019; Text: ROBINSON, BOBBY 02/07/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 1.58; Amount Paid: 1.58; Due Date: 2019-02-05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 205.0; Amount Paid: 205.0; Due Date: 2019-02-05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBINSON, BERNADINE; Text: ROBINSON, BERNADINE DELIVERED TO LCSO PICK UP BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBINSON, BOBBY; Text: ROBINSON, BOBBY DELIVERED TO LCSO PICK UP BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: FOR EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketDescription: PAID $46.58 ON RECEIPT 2425456, FULLY PAID; Text: $46.58 2425456 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2019

DocketDescription: PAID $160.00 ON RECEIPT 2425454, BALANCE DUE: $45.00; Text: $160.00 2425454 Balance Due: $45.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less