This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 02:28:30 (UTC).

VANLAARHOVEN, WILLIAM VS JONES, BRAD

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 VANLAARHOVEN, WILLIAM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, BRAD. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANLAARHOVEN, WILLIAM

Defendant

JONES, BRAD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE; OF RESCHEDULING MEDICATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 081220 @ 10:30 AM

07/02/2020: NOTICE; OF RESCHEDULING MEDICATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 081220 @ 10:30 AM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JONES, BRAD; JONES, BRAD AND SENT TO LCSO / COPY TO PLTF

04/01/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO JONES, BRAD; JONES, BRAD AND SENT TO LCSO / COPY TO PLTF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/06/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JONES, BRAD; JONES, BRAD LCSO

03/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO JONES, BRAD; JONES, BRAD LCSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $5,350.00; Book: 5538; Page: 170

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE; Text: OF RESCHEDULING MEDICATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 081220 @ 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) on 5/6/2020 10:30:00 AM due to TO BE RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JONES, BRAD / 04/03/2020; Text: JONES, BRAD 04/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2020-04-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2551637, FULLY PAID; Text: $10.00 2551637 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST; Text: FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: CANCELLED JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) ON 04/15/2020 9:00:00 AM DUE TO NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO JONES, BRAD; Text: JONES, BRAD 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 310.0; Amount Paid: 310.0; Due Date: 2020-03-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO JONES, BRAD; Text: JONES, BRAD LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 04/15/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 04/15/2020 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 2544488, FULLY PAID; Text: $310.00 2544488 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less