This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/06/2020 at 04:04:23 (UTC).

TOMMASELLO, ANTHONY Et Al VS FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 TOMMASELLO, ANTHONY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOMMASELLO, ANTHONY

TOMMASELLO, MELANIE

Defendant

FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS / 09/28/2019; FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS 09/28/2019

10/01/2019 CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS / 09/28/2019; FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS 09/28/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS; FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS AND MAILED CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFT / COPY MAILED TO PLTF

09/26/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS; FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS AND MAILED CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFT / COPY MAILED TO PLTF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/25/2019 STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; Text: DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; Text: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: STIPULATION; Book: 5370; Page: 1820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTFS PRESENT / DEFT PRESENT / STIP TP BE ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS / 09/28/2019; Text: FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS 09/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS; Text: FEAGLE, TRACY LAWS AND MAILED CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFT / COPY MAILED TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 11/6/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 11/6/2019 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 10.3; Amount Paid: 10.3; Due Date: 2019-09-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 310.0; Amount Paid: 310.0; Due Date: 2019-09-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $320.30 ON RECEIPT 2495249, FULLY PAID; Text: $320.30 2495249 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less