This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/20/2023 at 09:59:40 (UTC).

THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, BRANDY VS THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 THOMAS-ST JOSEPH, BRANDY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMAS-ST JOSEPH, ALYSSA. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAKAC, MICHAEL G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAKAC, MICHAEL G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, BRANDY

Respondent

THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GRAHAM, CORRIE ELLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - Domestic Bureau of Vital Statistics; Amount Due: 10.5; Amount Paid: 10.5; Due Date: 2022-06-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022

DocketDescription: PAID $10.50 ON RECEIPT 2744351, FULLY PAID; Text: $10.50 2744351 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022

DocketDescription: COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022

DocketDescription: VITAL STATISTIC FORM NOT SIGNED (FOR FUTURE USE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022

DocketDescription: BVS FORM OR FEE REQUESTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022

DocketDescription: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Text: Disposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022

DocketDescription: ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: GRAHAM, CORRIE ELLEN; Text: ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: GRAHAM, CORRIE ELLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022

DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED AND RECORDED; Book: 5959; Page: 1235

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

DocketDescription: ANSWER WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA; Text: THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - Domestic Filing Fee Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: 397.5; Amount Paid: 397.5; Due Date: 2022-01-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: PAID $397.50 ON RECEIPT 2706031, FULLY PAID; Text: $397.50 2706031 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Text: SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, BRANDY; Text: THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, BRANDY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE / AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS ON BEHALF OF THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, BRANDY; Text: THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, BRANDY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY OF PETITIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA; Text: THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA; Text: THOMAS-ST.JOSEPH, ALYSSA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Text: VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO MINOR CHILD(REN) AND REQUEST FOR OTHER RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less