This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 19:25:36 (UTC).

STATE ATTORNEY VS JACKSON, MARSHALL S

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE ATTORNEY filed an Other lawsuit against JACKSON, MARSHALL S. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STATE ATTORNEY

Respondent

JACKSON, MARSHALL S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MHJR - JIMMY RYCE HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: SET ON MHJR - JIMMY RYCE HEARING DOCKET 4/15/2021 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM; Text: MHJR - JIMMY RYCE HEARING 4/15/2021 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: COPY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Text: ATTACHMENTS TO PETITION FOR COMMITMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE, SETTING TRIAL AND APPOINTING PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: PETITION FOR COMMITMENT UNDER F.S. 394.911-394.930(JIMMY RYCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF STATE ATTORNEY OF DA is a litigant