This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/27/2023 at 08:25:45 (UTC).

SCOTT, MICHAEL W, SCOTT, THOMAS W Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 SCOTT, MICHAEL W, SCOTT, THOMAS W was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCOTT, MICHAEL W

Decedent

SCOTT, THOMAS W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWIGERT, BRETT L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED; Text: SELF PROVEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Probate Formal Administration; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2023-01-17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2798838, FULLY PAID; Text: $400.00 2798838 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: CHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less