This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 01:16:51 (UTC).

SCOTT, JOHN R VS MACFARLAND, MARTHA

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 SCOTT, JOHN R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MACFARLAND, MARTHA. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NEAL, TERRY T and PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NEAL, TERRY T

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT, JOHN R

Defendant

MACFARLAND, MARTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WILKES, THOMAS J

301 East Pine Street Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING; SET FOR 042921 @ 1:30PM

03/05/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING; SET FOR 042921 @ 1:30PM

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

08/05/2020: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE; OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 080520 @ 3:30PM

07/02/2020: NOTICE; OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 080520 @ 3:30PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; / THOMAS J WILKES ESQ FOR DEFT

03/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; / THOMAS J WILKES ESQ FOR DEFT

CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO MACFARLAND, MARTHA / 03/03/2020; MACFARLAND, MARTHA 03/03/2020

03/05/2020: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO MACFARLAND, MARTHA / 03/03/2020; MACFARLAND, MARTHA 03/03/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MACFARLAND, MARTHA; MACFARLAND, MARTHA CERTIFIED MAIL

02/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO MACFARLAND, MARTHA; MACFARLAND, MARTHA CERTIFIED MAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/28/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

02/28/2020: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

CHECK LIST

02/28/2020: CHECK LIST

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2541906, FULLY PAID; $10.00 2541906 Fully Paid

02/28/2020: PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2541906, FULLY PAID; $10.00 2541906 Fully Paid

PAID $86.90 ON RECEIPT 2541861, FULLY PAID; $86.90 2541861 Fully Paid

02/28/2020: PAID $86.90 ON RECEIPT 2541861, FULLY PAID; $86.90 2541861 Fully Paid

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC); Location: TAVARES; Room: CRP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Text: / AMENDED AS TO DATE AND TIME / 060321 @ 10:00AM / PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) DOCKET 6/3/2021 BEGINNING AT 10:00 AM; Text: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) 6/3/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Text: SET FOR 042921 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2020-38-A DATED DECEMBER 14, 2020; Text: NEAL, TERRY T PEPPERMAN, CARLA R Per Admin Order L-2020-38-A dated December 14, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE; Text: OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 080520 @ 3:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) on 4/1/2020 11:00:00 AM due to TO BE RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Text: / THOMAS J WILKES ESQ FOR DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 6.9; Amount Paid: 6.9; Due Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim $100 to $500; Amount Due: 80.0; Amount Paid: 80.0; Due Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO MACFARLAND, MARTHA; Text: MACFARLAND, MARTHA CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 4/1/2020 BEGINNING AT 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 4/1/2020 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2541906, FULLY PAID; Text: $10.00 2541906 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $86.90 ON RECEIPT 2541861, FULLY PAID; Text: $86.90 2541861 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less