This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/14/2020 at 00:28:36 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, ANGELA VS COLON, LARRY

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 SANCHEZ, ANGELA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COLON, LARRY. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, ANGELA

Defendant

COLON, LARRY

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $5,215.75; Book: 5374; Page: 223

11/14/2019 FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $5,215.75; Book: 5374; Page: 223

SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLON, LARRY; COLON, LARRY

09/27/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLON, LARRY; COLON, LARRY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLON, LARRY; COLON, LARRY CERTIFIED MAIL

07/23/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLON, LARRY; COLON, LARRY CERTIFIED MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $5,215.75; Book: 5374; Page: 223

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; Text: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO COLON, LARRY / 10/01/2019; Text: COLON, LARRY 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2496222, FULLY PAID; Text: $10.00 2496222 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLON, LARRY; Text: COLON, LARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: 09/25/19 REQUESTING ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO COLON, LARRY; Text: COLON, LARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 310.0; Amount Paid: 310.0; Due Date: 2019-07-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLON, LARRY; Text: COLON, LARRY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 8/28/2019 BEGINNING AT 10:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 8/28/2019 10:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $327.89 ON RECEIPT 2476065, FULLY PAID; Text: $327.89 2476065 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 11.09; Amount Paid: 11.09; Due Date: 2019-07-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 6.8; Amount Paid: 6.8; Due Date: 2019-07-23

    Read MoreRead Less