This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 07:29:34 (UTC).

RYALS, EVA VS NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 RYALS, EVA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYALS, EVA

Defendant

NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT; IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,350.00 // SIGNED 04.17.19; Book: 5266; Page: 935

04/17/2019 FINAL JUDGMENT; IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,350.00 // SIGNED 04.17.19; Book: 5266; Page: 935

AFFIDAVIT; PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

04/09/2019 AFFIDAVIT; PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

03/06/2019 OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA / 01/30/2019; NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA 01/30/2019

01/31/2019 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA / 01/30/2019; NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA 01/30/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED TO NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA; NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA

01/29/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA; NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/28/2019 STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,350.00 // SIGNED 04.17.19; Book: 5266; Page: 935

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC); Location: TAVARES; Room: TTN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 3.5; Amount Paid: 3.5; Due Date: 2019-04-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT; Text: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: (PTC); Text: PLAINTIFF PRESENT / DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT / COURT: FINAL JUDGMENT TO ENTER UPON PLAINTIFF FILING THEIR AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $3.50 ON RECEIPT 2444955, FULLY PAID; Text: $3.50 2444955 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Text: FOR 04/09/19 @ 9AM (PTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) DOCKET 04/09/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM; Text: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) 04/09/2019 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF PRESENT (PRO-SE) / DEFT PRESENT (PRO-SE) / SET FOR PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA / 01/30/2019; Text: NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA; Text: NARCISSE, MARIE ALTAGRACIA SAMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 3/6/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 3/6/2019 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 310.0; Amount Paid: 310.0; Due Date: 2019-01-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 2423012, FULLY PAID; Text: $310.00 2423012 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less