This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/20/2023 at 10:34:14 (UTC).

RATH HARPER AND ASSOCIATES INC DBA RH MANAGEMENT AS AGENT FOR THE OWNER VS FELTON, RYLEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 RATH HARPER AND ASSOCIATES INC DBA RH MANAGEMENT AS AGENT FOR THE OWNER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FELTON, RYLEY. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURINGTON, EMILY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURINGTON, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RATH HARPER AND ASSOCIATES INC DBA RH MANAGEMENT AS AGENT FOR THE OWNER

Defendants

HADDEN, KAYLA

FELTON, RYLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYTER, JOHN F

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED; WRIT POSTED 03/29/2022/ WRIT CANCELLED 03/28/2022

03/29/2022: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED; WRIT POSTED 03/29/2022/ WRIT CANCELLED 03/28/2022

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

03/18/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; / SCANNED

03/17/2022: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; / SCANNED

PROPOSED DOCUMENT; / WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/17/2022: PROPOSED DOCUMENT; / WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; 03.17.22; Book: 5919; Page: 258

03/17/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; 03.17.22; Book: 5919; Page: 258

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

03/16/2022: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

STIPULATION; TO STAY EVICTION COMPLAINT / (ORDER TO FOLLOW)

01/27/2022: STIPULATION; TO STAY EVICTION COMPLAINT / (ORDER TO FOLLOW)

COPY OF; PREVIOUSLY FILED RETURN OF SERVICE

01/26/2022: COPY OF; PREVIOUSLY FILED RETURN OF SERVICE

COPY OF; PREVIOUSLY FILED RETURN OF SERVICE

01/26/2022: COPY OF; PREVIOUSLY FILED RETURN OF SERVICE

5/20 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUM ISSUED TO FELTON, RYLEY; FELTON, RYLEY

01/13/2022: 5/20 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUM ISSUED TO FELTON, RYLEY; FELTON, RYLEY

5/20 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUM ISSUED TO HADDEN, KAYLA; HADDEN, KAYLA

01/13/2022: 5/20 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUM ISSUED TO HADDEN, KAYLA; HADDEN, KAYLA

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2706359, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2706359 Fully Paid

01/13/2022: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2706359, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2706359 Fully Paid

PROPOSED DOCUMENT; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/13/2022: PROPOSED DOCUMENT; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK; AS TO RYLEY FELTON

01/13/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK; AS TO RYLEY FELTON

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK; AS TO KAYLA HADDEN

01/13/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK; AS TO KAYLA HADDEN

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; AND COSTS

01/13/2022: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; AND COSTS

COMPLAINT; FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES//COUNT I AND II

01/13/2022: COMPLAINT; FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES//COUNT I AND II

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED; Text: WRIT POSTED 03/29/2022/ WRIT CANCELLED 03/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Text: OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; Text: / SCANNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PROPOSED DOCUMENT; Text: / WRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Text: 03.17.22; Book: 5919; Page: 258

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: STIPULATION; Text: TO STAY EVICTION COMPLAINT / (ORDER TO FOLLOW)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COPY OF; Text: PREVIOUSLY FILED RETURN OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COPY OF; Text: PREVIOUSLY FILED RETURN OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5/20 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO HADDEN, KAYLA / 01/21/2022; Text: HADDEN, KAYLA 01/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
01/13/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2022-01-13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5/20 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUM ISSUED TO FELTON, RYLEY; Text: FELTON, RYLEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5/20 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUM ISSUED TO HADDEN, KAYLA; Text: HADDEN, KAYLA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2706359, FULLY PAID; Text: $205.00 2706359 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PROPOSED DOCUMENT; Text: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK; Text: AS TO RYLEY FELTON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK; Text: AS TO KAYLA HADDEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; Text: AND COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES//COUNT I AND II

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less