This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 19:58:01 (UTC).

RAGIN, LAFONDA VS EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 RAGIN, LAFONDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAGIN, LAFONDA

Defendant

EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $1,190.90; Book: 5438; Page: 1195

03/13/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $1,190.90; Book: 5438; Page: 1195

CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; PLTF

03/04/2020: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

03/04/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

03/04/2020: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, / 02/07/2020; EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, 02/07/2020

02/12/2020: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, / 02/07/2020; EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, 02/07/2020

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

02/04/2020: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

CHECK LIST

02/04/2020: CHECK LIST

PAID $191.90 ON RECEIPT 2533893, FULLY PAID; $191.90 2533893 Fully Paid

02/04/2020: PAID $191.90 ON RECEIPT 2533893, FULLY PAID; $191.90 2533893 Fully Paid

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/04/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA,; EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, CERTIFIED MAIL

02/04/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA,; EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, CERTIFIED MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $1,190.90; Book: 5438; Page: 1195

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; Text: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Text: PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, / 02/07/2020; Text: EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 6.9; Amount Paid: 6.9; Due Date: 2020-02-04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2020-02-04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA,; Text: EUSTIS FAMILY DENTAL SPA, CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 3/4/2020 BEGINNING AT 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 3/4/2020 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $191.90 ON RECEIPT 2533893, FULLY PAID; Text: $191.90 2533893 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less