This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Lake County on 10/08/2021 at 09:00:38 (UTC).

PAUL, JOSHUA VS CAPTAIN EDWARDS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 PAUL, JOSHUA filed an Other lawsuit against CAPTAIN EDWARDS. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Lake County, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SINGELTARY, G RICHARD and MOSLEY, DAN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

MOSLEY, DAN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUL, JOSHUA

Defendants

GRINNELL AS SHERIFF OF LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, PEYTON C

MAJOR JENSEN

CAPTAIN EDWARDS

LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMAND

09/10/2021: COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMAND

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/10/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PROPOSED DOCUMENT

09/10/2021: PROPOSED DOCUMENT

CLERK'S LETTER; RE: CORRECT INDIGENT FORM FOR NEW CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE

09/10/2021: CLERK'S LETTER; RE: CORRECT INDIGENT FORM FOR NEW CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE

AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY

09/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY

CHECKLIST FOR WAIVER OF PREPAYMENT OF COURT COSTS AND FEES FOR INDIGENT PRISONERS

10/01/2021: CHECKLIST FOR WAIVER OF PREPAYMENT OF COURT COSTS AND FEES FOR INDIGENT PRISONERS

MEMORANDUM; FROM CLERK TO JUDGE RE: ORDER FOR PRISONER TO MAKE MONTHLY PAYMENTS // E-MAILED TO JA 10/1/21

10/01/2021: MEMORANDUM; FROM CLERK TO JUDGE RE: ORDER FOR PRISONER TO MAKE MONTHLY PAYMENTS // E-MAILED TO JA 10/1/21

CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

10/01/2021: CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MEMORANDUM; Text: FROM CLERK TO JUDGE RE: ORDER FOR PRISONER TO MAKE MONTHLY PAYMENTS // E-MAILED TO JA 10/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECKLIST FOR WAIVER OF PREPAYMENT OF COURT COSTS AND FEES FOR INDIGENT PRISONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Filing Fee; Amount Due: 400.0; Balance: 400.0; Due Date: 2021-09-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CLERK'S LETTER; Text: RE: CORRECT INDIGENT FORM FOR NEW CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROPOSED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: JURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where GRINNELL LLC is a litigant