This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/20/2023 at 17:14:59 (UTC).

MERRICK BANK VS LAKE COUNTY TOW

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 MERRICK BANK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAKE COUNTY TOW. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRICK BANK

Defendant

LAKE COUNTY TOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLMES, BRANDON

Defendant Attorney

REED, JENNIFER D

 

Court Documents

PAID $12,862.24 ON RECEIPT 2708375, FULLY PAID; $12,862.24 2708375 Fully Paid

01/21/2022: PAID $12,862.24 ON RECEIPT 2708375, FULLY PAID; $12,862.24 2708375 Fully Paid

PAID $12,862.24 ON RECEIPT 2708375, FULLY PAID; $12,862.24 2708375 Fully Paid

01/21/2022: PAID $12,862.24 ON RECEIPT 2708375, FULLY PAID; $12,862.24 2708375 Fully Paid

COPY OF; INVOICE AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

01/21/2022: COPY OF; INVOICE AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CHECK LIST

01/21/2022: CHECK LIST

CERTIFICATE; OF POSTING BOND TO RELEASE WRECKER OPERATOR'S LIEN F S 713.78(5)(B)

01/21/2022: CERTIFICATE; OF POSTING BOND TO RELEASE WRECKER OPERATOR'S LIEN F S 713.78(5)(B)

MOTION; TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

04/13/2022: MOTION; TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

COVER LETTER DATED; 041322 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

04/28/2022: COVER LETTER DATED; 041322 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER; GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

04/28/2022: ORDER; GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

NOTICE; OF COMPLIANCE / FILED BY PLTF

05/04/2022: NOTICE; OF COMPLIANCE / FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF; JENNIFER D REED ESQ FOR DEFT

05/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF; JENNIFER D REED ESQ FOR DEFT

RETURN OF SERVICE; RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE / UNEXECUTED

08/22/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE; RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE / UNEXECUTED

 

Docket Entries

08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Text: RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE / UNEXECUTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF; Text: JENNIFER D REED ESQ FOR DEFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE; Text: OF COMPLIANCE / FILED BY PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: 041322 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: TO ENFORCE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - Traffic Overage Fee; Amount Paid: 0.01; Due Date: 2022-01-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - Traffic Refund under $10.00; Due Date: 2022-01-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - Traffic Refund under $10.00; Due Date: 2022-01-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

FinancialDescription: Registry; Amount Due: 12862.24; Amount Paid: 12862.24; Due Date: 2022-01-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Text: OF POSTING BOND TO RELEASE WRECKER OPERATOR'S LIEN F S 713.78(5)(B)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COPY OF; Text: INVOICE AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $12,862.24 ON RECEIPT 2708375, FULLY PAID; Text: $12,862.24 2708375 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

DocketDescription: REVISED, RECEIPT NUMBER 2708375; Text: 2708375

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $12,862.24 ON RECEIPT 2708375, FULLY PAID; Text: $12,862.24 2708375 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less