This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 01:16:44 (UTC).

MCGILL, MATTHEW VS TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 MCGILL, MATTHEW filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NEAL, TERRY T and PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NEAL, TERRY T

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGILL, MATTHEW

Defendant

TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WILKES, THOMAS J

301 East Pine Street Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING; SET FOR 042921 @ 1:30PM / PTC

03/05/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING; SET FOR 042921 @ 1:30PM / PTC

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

08/05/2020: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE; OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 080520 @ 1:30PM

07/02/2020: NOTICE; OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 080520 @ 1:30PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; / THOMAS J WILKES ESQ FOR DEFT

03/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; / THOMAS J WILKES ESQ FOR DEFT

CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, / 03/03/2020; TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, 03/03/2020

03/05/2020: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, / 03/03/2020; TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, 03/03/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS,; TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, CERTIFIED MAIL

02/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS,; TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, CERTIFIED MAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/28/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

02/28/2020: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

CHECK LIST

02/28/2020: CHECK LIST

PAID $100.40 ON RECEIPT 2541867, FULLY PAID; $100.40 2541867 Fully Paid

02/28/2020: PAID $100.40 ON RECEIPT 2541867, FULLY PAID; $100.40 2541867 Fully Paid

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC); Location: TAVARES; Room: CRP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Text: / AMENDED AS TO DATE AND TIME / 060321 @ 10:00AM / PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) DOCKET 6/3/2021 BEGINNING AT 10:00 AM; Text: PT - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (SC/CC) 6/3/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Text: SET FOR 042921 @ 1:30PM / PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2020-38-A DATED DECEMBER 14, 2020; Text: NEAL, TERRY T PEPPERMAN, CARLA R Per Admin Order L-2020-38-A dated December 14, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE; Text: OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 080520 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) on 4/1/2020 11:00:00 AM due to TO BE RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Text: / THOMAS J WILKES ESQ FOR DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, / 03/03/2020; Text: TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 10.4; Amount Paid: 10.4; Due Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim $100 to $500; Amount Due: 90.0; Amount Paid: 90.0; Due Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS,; Text: TOWN OF HOWEY IN THE HILLS, CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 4/1/2020 BEGINNING AT 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 4/1/2020 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $100.40 ON RECEIPT 2541867, FULLY PAID; Text: $100.40 2541867 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less