This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2020 at 23:30:02 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, JUANA VS JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 MARTINEZ, JUANA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, JUANA

Defendant

JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $5,310.35; Book: 5412; Page: 400

01/28/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $5,310.35; Book: 5412; Page: 400

AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

01/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

01/22/2020: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

(MEDIATION); PLAINTIFF PRESENT (PRO-SE) / DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

01/22/2020: (MEDIATION); PLAINTIFF PRESENT (PRO-SE) / DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC, / 12/16/2019; JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC, 12/16/2019

12/17/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC, / 12/16/2019; JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC, 12/16/2019

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/09/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

12/09/2019: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

CHECK LIST

12/09/2019: CHECK LIST

PAID $310.35 ON RECEIPT 2517788, FULLY PAID; $310.35 2517788 Fully Paid

12/09/2019: PAID $310.35 ON RECEIPT 2517788, FULLY PAID; $310.35 2517788 Fully Paid

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC,; JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC,

12/10/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED TO JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC,; JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC,

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $5,310.35; Book: 5412; Page: 400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLAINTIFF PRESENT (PRO-SE) / DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC, / 12/16/2019; Text: JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC, 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC,; Text: JCL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 1/22/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 1/22/2020 9:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 0.35; Amount Paid: 0.35; Due Date: 2019-12-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 310.0; Amount Paid: 310.0; Due Date: 2019-12-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $310.35 ON RECEIPT 2517788, FULLY PAID; Text: $310.35 2517788 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less