This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/05/2020 at 04:08:36 (UTC).

LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER INC VS BLOUNT, INDIA

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BLOUNT, INDIA. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NEAL, TERRY T and NIMETH, JASON J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NEAL, TERRY T

NIMETH, JASON J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER INC

Defendant

BLOUNT, INDIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER L-2018-68-C; Text: NEAL, TERRY T NIMETH, JASON J PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER L-2018-68-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO BLOUNT, INDIA / 09/19/2019; Text: BLOUNT, INDIA 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 195.0; Amount Paid: 195.0; Due Date: 2019-09-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BLOUNT, INDIA; Text: BLOUNT, INDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 2492100, FULLY PAID; Text: $195.00 2492100 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant