This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 01:16:24 (UTC).

JEANTY BASHIR, MAGALY VS CAPUTO, MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 JEANTY BASHIR, MAGALY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAPUTO, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NEAL, TERRY T and PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NEAL, TERRY T

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEANTY BASHIR, MAGALY

Defendants

CAPUTO, MICHAEL

ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN ALIAS / LCSO

03/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN ALIAS / LCSO

COPY OF; ADDRESS INFORMATION

02/28/2020: COPY OF; ADDRESS INFORMATION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/28/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

02/28/2020: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

CHECK LIST

02/28/2020: CHECK LIST

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAPUTO, MICHAEL; CAPUTO, MICHAEL LCSO

02/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAPUTO, MICHAEL; CAPUTO, MICHAEL LCSO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN LCSO

02/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN LCSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2020-38-A DATED DECEMBER 14, 2020; Text: NEAL, TERRY T PEPPERMAN, CARLA R Per Admin Order L-2020-38-A dated December 14, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) on 4/1/2020 11:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; Text: ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2020-03-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; Text: ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN ALIAS / LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Text: REQUESTING ALIAS SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2546816, FULLY PAID; Text: $10.00 2546816 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; Text: ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO CAPUTO, MICHAEL / 03/02/2020; Text: CAPUTO, MICHAEL 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 195.0; Amount Paid: 195.0; Due Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAPUTO, MICHAEL; Text: CAPUTO, MICHAEL LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN; Text: ORTIZ NAZARIO, JORDAN LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 4/1/2020 BEGINNING AT 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 4/1/2020 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COPY OF; Text: ADDRESS INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 2541959, FULLY PAID; Text: $195.00 2541959 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less