This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 06/18/2022 at 09:00:12 (UTC).

IRIZARRY, JANET VS IRIZARRY, RENE

Case Summary

On 05/21/2022 IRIZARRY, JANET filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against IRIZARRY, RENE. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RADA, CARY F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RADA, CARY F

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IRIZARRY, JANET

Respondent

IRIZARRY, RENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/31/2022

HearingEvent Type: I - INJUNCTION HEARING - CIVIL - TEMP; Location: TAVARES; Room: CFR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022

DocketDescription: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Text: Disposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER DISSOLVING OR DECLINING TO ENTER INJUNCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022

DocketDescription: INJUNCTION COURT SHEET -; Text: HEARING HELD 05/31/2022; INJUNCTION DENIED AFTER TESTIMONY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022

DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED -; Text: EX PARTE TEMP INJ (HEARING DATE 05/31/2022) SERVED TO RENE IRIZARRY INDIVIDUALLY ON 05/21/22 BY LCSO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketDescription: SET ON I - INJUNCTION HEARING - CIVIL - TEMP DOCKET 5/31/2022 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM RADA, CARY F; Text: I - INJUNCTION HEARING - CIVIL - TEMP 5/31/2022 9:00 AM RADA, CARY F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2022

DocketDescription: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN; Text: EX PARTE; HEARING SET FOR 05/31/2022 AT 9AM; COPY TO PETITIONER BY HAND; COPY TO RESPONDENT TO LCSO FOR SERVICE; COPY TO LCSO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2022

DocketDescription: SHERIFF'S INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2022

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less