This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 05/08/2020 at 10:45:46 (UTC).

HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE VS HUNTER, CHARLES BOBBY

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUNTER, CHARLES BOBBY. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELKE, BRIAN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELKE, BRIAN J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE

Respondent

HUNTER, CHARLES BOBBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CERSINE, MATTHEW

Respondent Attorney

FISHER, JODY L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/16/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Text: OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020

DocketDescription: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2020

DocketDescription: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Text: NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONER'S UPDATED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF FILING; Text: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF FILING; Text: PETITIONER'S RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE BY HUNTER, CHARLES BOBBY; Text: HUNTER, CHARLES BOBBY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketDescription: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

FinancialDescription: Lake - Domestic Counter Petition Fee $295; Amount Due: 295.0; Amount Paid: 295.0; Due Date: 2020-01-09

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

DocketDescription: PAID $295.00 ON RECEIPT 2526386, FULLY PAID; Text: $295.00 2526386 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE; Text: HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE; Text: HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: COPY OF LICENSE OF HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE; Text: HUNTER, CATHERINE JEANETTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: MEMORANDUM; Text: FOR CERTIFICATION OF MILITARY SERVICE//OB CHARLES BOBBY HUNTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Text: SSIGNED BY PETITIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET PRO SE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019

DocketDescription: PAID $408.00 ON RECEIPT 2499236, FULLY PAID; Text: $408.00 2499236 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less