This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 15:05:22 (UTC).

HENLEY SR, BRIAN LEE VS LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 HENLEY SR, BRIAN LEE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENLEY SR, BRIAN LEE

Defendant

LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE; Book: 5535; Page: 1998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: ON PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS // PETITIONER HAS LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED; Text: AS TO OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED; Text: AS TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: CLERK'S LETTER; Text: RE: FS 79.071 VIA REGULAR MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: CLERK'S LETTER; Text: RE: FS 79.071 VIA CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: CLERK'S LETTER; Text: RE: FS 79.071 VIA CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY; Text: DOCKET SHEET // TRANSFER FROM ALACHUA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY; Text: OF ORDER TRANSFERRING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS // TRANSFER FROM ALACHUA COUNTY // E-MAILED JUDGE'S OFFICE 5/4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant