This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/14/2020 at 00:28:32 (UTC).

HASHMAN, LYNDA VS LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 HASHMAN, LYNDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASHMAN, LYNDA

Defendant

LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAYES, ANDREW I

2426 Bond Avenue

Clearwater, FL 33759

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5374; Page: 447

11/14/2019 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5374; Page: 447

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

11/06/2019 OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

(MEDIATION); PLTF NOT PRESENT / DEFT PRESENT / ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

11/06/2019 (MEDIATION); PLTF NOT PRESENT / DEFT PRESENT / ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

LETTER; FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF

10/08/2019 LETTER; FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF

LETTER; FROM PLAINTIFF / MOTION AGAINST LADY LAKE POLICE DEPTARTMENT

10/07/2019 LETTER; FROM PLAINTIFF / MOTION AGAINST LADY LAKE POLICE DEPTARTMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT,; LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT,

09/30/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT,; LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT,

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2019 STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5374; Page: 447

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF NOT PRESENT / DEFT PRESENT / ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO DISMISS; Text: FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: COPY OF; Text: NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF ANDREW I DAYES ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF; Text: ANDREW I DAYES ESQ ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Text: FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Text: FROM PLAINTIFF / MOTION AGAINST LADY LAKE POLICE DEPTARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT, / 10/02/2019; Text: LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT, 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT,; Text: LADY LAKE POLICE DEPT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 11/6/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 11/6/2019 9:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 6.8; Amount Paid: 6.8; Due Date: 2019-09-27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2019-09-27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 6.71; Amount Paid: 6.71; Due Date: 2019-09-27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Due Date: 2019-09-27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $198.51 ON RECEIPT 2496262, FULLY PAID; Text: $198.51 2496262 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAYES , ANDREW IAN