This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2023 at 03:11:49 (UTC).

GLANDER, ANDREW J. VS FUTURE MOTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 GLANDER, ANDREW J filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FUTURE MOTION, INC. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSLEY, DAN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSLEY, DAN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLANDER, ANDREW J.

Defendant

FUTURE MOTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEBER, BRANDEN

Defendant Attorneys

HOLT, MICHAEL R

CORDOVA, LIGIANETTE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/28/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER OF FUTURE MOTION, INC.,; FUTURE MOTION, INC.,

03/10/2022: ANSWER OF FUTURE MOTION, INC.,; FUTURE MOTION, INC.,

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES FROM PLAINTIFF

08/26/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES FROM PLAINTIFF

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/24/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF; BRANDEN WEBER, ESQ

08/10/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF; BRANDEN WEBER, ESQ

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/31/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/29/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Text: AND JURY TRIAL AND ORDER OF MEDIATION // PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 5, 2023 AT 10:30 AM // TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 18, 2023 AT 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Text: WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES FROM PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF; Text: BRANDEN WEBER, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER OF FUTURE MOTION, INC.,; Text: FUTURE MOTION, INC.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Text: MICHAEL R HOLT AND LIGIANETTE CORDOVA FOR DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO FUTURE MOTION, INC., / 02/17/2022; Text: FUTURE MOTION, INC., 02/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO FUTURE MOTION, INC.,; Text: FUTURE MOTION, INC.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2022-02-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Filing Fee; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2022-02-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2711426, FULLY PAID; Text: $410.00 2711426 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: JURY TRIAL DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less