This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 01:44:25 (UTC).

GARDNER, STREET VS KAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 GARDNER, STREET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARDNER, STREET

Defendants

KAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK

RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK; RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK LCSO

03/03/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK; RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK LCSO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/02/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5526; Page: 591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE; Text: OF RESCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) FOR 080620 @ 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) on 4/8/2020 9:00:00 AM due to TO BE RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK / 03/06/2020; Text: RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: MAIL RETURNED; Text: PLAINTIFFS COPY OF SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE // RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK; Text: RAMCHANDAN, DEEPAK LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 4/8/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 4/8/2020 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 0.45; Amount Paid: 0.45; Due Date: 2020-03-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 5.0; Amount Paid: 5.0; Due Date: 2020-03-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Due Date: 2020-03-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION AS INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $0.45 ON RECEIPT 2542426, FULLY PAID; Text: $0.45 2542426 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $5.00 ON RECEIPT 2542423, FULLY PAID; Text: $5.00 2542423 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less