This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 07:26:24 (UTC).

ELY, PETER VS COLE EHLINGER, SHERRYL

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 ELY, PETER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COLE EHLINGER, SHERRYL. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELY, PETER

Defendant

COLE EHLINGER, SHERRYL

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5248; Page: 286

03/13/2019 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5248; Page: 286

SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE-EHLINGER, SHERRYL; COLE-EHLINGER, SHERRYL

01/24/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE-EHLINGER, SHERRYL; COLE-EHLINGER, SHERRYL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/23/2019 STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 5248; Page: 286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST; Text: FROM PLAINTIFF TO DISMISS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF PRESENT (PRO-SE) / DEFT PRESENT (PRO-SE) // SET FOR PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO COLE EHLINGER, SHERRYL / 02/08/2019; Text: COLE EHLINGER, SHERRYL 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE-EHLINGER, SHERRYL; Text: COLE-EHLINGER, SHERRYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 2/27/2019 BEGINNING AT 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 2/27/2019 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2019-01-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 2421433, FULLY PAID; Text: $185.00 2421433 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less