This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/02/2023 at 09:09:24 (UTC).

DYCK O NEAL INC VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIM

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 DYCK O NEAL INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIM. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYCK O NEAL INC

Defendants

WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON, AYANNA N

WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, AYANNA N

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELANSON, KYLE

1515 South Federal Highway, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

12/05/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

12/05/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/05/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/05/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/05/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/05/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF FILING; PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE // ATTACHED

12/05/2022: NOTICE OF FILING; PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE // ATTACHED

LIS PENDENS; Book: 6062; Page: 501

12/05/2022: LIS PENDENS; Book: 6062; Page: 501

COMPLAINT; MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

12/05/2022: COMPLAINT; MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

PAID $954.00 ON RECEIPT 2788638, FULLY PAID; $954.00 2788638 Fully Paid

12/06/2022: PAID $954.00 ON RECEIPT 2788638, FULLY PAID; $954.00 2788638 Fully Paid

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON, AYANNA N; WILSON, AYANNA N

12/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON, AYANNA N; WILSON, AYANNA N

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, AYANNA N; WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, AYANNA N

12/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, AYANNA N; WILSON AKA AYANNA WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, AYANNA N

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1,; UNKNOWN TENANT 1,

12/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1,; UNKNOWN TENANT 1,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE,; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE,

12/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE,; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE,

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/29/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Lis Pendens Indexing > 4 (eFiled); Amount Due: 4.0; Amount Paid: 4.0; Due Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Lis Pendens Recording Fee (eFiled); Amount Due: 5.0; Amount Paid: 5.0; Due Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Real Property $50,000 < $250,000; Amount Due: 905.0; Amount Paid: 905.0; Due Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE,; Text: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1,; Text: UNKNOWN TENANT 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Book: 6062; Page: 501

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF FILING; Text: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE // ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less