This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 07:50:17 (UTC).

DOROBAN, TONI VS IMPORTS PROFESSIONAL AUTO REPAIR

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 DOROBAN, TONI filed an Other lawsuit against IMPORTS PROFESSIONAL AUTO REPAIR. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOROBAN, TONI

Defendant

IMPORTS PROFESSIONAL AUTO REPAIR

 

Court Documents

REQUEST; FOR FUNDS IN THE REGISTRY

03/26/2019 REQUEST; FOR FUNDS IN THE REGISTRY

CERTIFICATE

03/08/2019 CERTIFICATE

COPY OF; REPAIR INVOICE AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

03/07/2019 COPY OF; REPAIR INVOICE AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CHECK LIST

03/07/2019 CHECK LIST

PAID $2,171.75 ON RECEIPT 2435369, FULLY PAID; $2,171.75 2435369 Fully Paid

03/07/2019 PAID $2,171.75 ON RECEIPT 2435369, FULLY PAID; $2,171.75 2435369 Fully Paid

 

Docket Entries

08/28/2019

DocketDescription: REFUND REQUEST ISSUED; Text: 2486985 $2,130.91 IMPORTS PROFESSIONAL AUTO REPAIR LLC C/O CYNTHIA CONLIN AND ASSOCIATES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2019

DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY; Text: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED UNDER 2019SC1949 / CLERK TO DISBURSE THE $2,130.91 CASH BOND TO IMPORTS PROFESSIONAL AUTO REPAIR LLC (TO BE APPLIED TOWARD THE JUDGMENT AMOUNT IN CS#19SC1949)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REQUEST; Text: FOR FUNDS IN THE REGISTRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 1.38; Amount Paid: 1.38; Due Date: 2019-03-07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019

FinancialDescription: Registry; Amount Due: 2170.37; Amount Paid: 2170.37; Due Date: 2019-03-07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COPY OF; Text: REPAIR INVOICE AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $2,171.75 ON RECEIPT 2435369, FULLY PAID; Text: $2,171.75 2435369 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less