This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/17/2022 at 09:00:36 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS VS HOEHN, JAMES

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS filed an Other lawsuit against HOEHN, JAMES. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Respondent

HOEHN, JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE; Location: TAVARES; Room: 5TH FLOOR CONFERENCE ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Text: Disposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON PETITION FOR CONTINUING TREATMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR TREATMENT ORDER AND ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SET ON MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE DOCKET 7/29/2022 BEGINNING AT 8:45 AM; Text: MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE 7/29/2022 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: PETITION FOR CONTINUING TREATMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant