This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 00:16:00 (UTC).

DEALER SELECT AUTO VS WILLIAMS, THERESA M

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 DEALER SELECT AUTO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, THERESA M. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEALER SELECT AUTO

Defendant

WILLIAMS, THERESA M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, THERESA M; WILLIAMS, THERESA M LCSO

09/23/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, THERESA M; WILLIAMS, THERESA M LCSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: STIPULATION; Book: 5366; Page: 1194

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF PRESENT / DEFT PRESENT / STIPULATION TO BE ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO WILLIAMS, THERESA M / 09/26/2019; Text: WILLIAMS, THERESA M 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 3.5; Amount Paid: 3.5; Due Date: 2019-09-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 310.0; Amount Paid: 310.0; Due Date: 2019-09-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, THERESA M; Text: WILLIAMS, THERESA M LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 10/30/2019 BEGINNING AT 10:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 10/30/2019 10:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $313.50 ON RECEIPT 2494330, FULLY PAID; Text: $313.50 2494330 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEALER SELECT AUTO SALES is a litigant