This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 01:56:01 (UTC).

DEALER SELECT AUTO SALES VS DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 DEALER SELECT AUTO SALES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEALER SELECT AUTO SALES

Defendants

DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T

DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN

 

Court Documents

CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF

10/30/2019 CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

10/30/2019 OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

(MEDIATION); PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

10/30/2019 (MEDIATION); PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

REQUEST; UPDATED REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS FOR CHARLES AND JACQUELYNN DAUGHERTY

09/23/2019 REQUEST; UPDATED REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS FOR CHARLES AND JACQUELYNN DAUGHERTY

REQUEST; FOR ALIAS SUMMONES TO BE ISSUED TO CHARLES AND JACQUELYNN DAUGHERTY

09/20/2019 REQUEST; FOR ALIAS SUMMONES TO BE ISSUED TO CHARLES AND JACQUELYNN DAUGHERTY

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN

08/15/2019 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/12/2019 STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN

09/23/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T; DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T

09/23/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T; DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN LCSO

08/13/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN LCSO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T; DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T LCSO

08/13/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T; DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T LCSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDescription: MAIL RETURNED; Text: CERTIFIED SUMMONS RETURNED REFUSED AS TO JACQUELYN DAUGHERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDescription: MAIL RETURNED; Text: CERTIFIED SUMMONS RETURNED REFUSED AS TO CHARLES DAUGHTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 13.6; Amount Paid: 13.6; Due Date: 2019-09-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2019-09-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2019-09-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; Text: DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T; Text: DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED AS TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; Text: DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN; Text: DAUGHERTY, JACQUELYN LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T; Text: DAUGHERTY, CHARLES T LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 9/18/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 9/18/2019 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim $100 to $500; Amount Due: 100.0; Amount Paid: 100.0; Due Date: 2019-08-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 2482020, FULLY PAID; Text: $100.00 2482020 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEALER SELECT AUTO SALES is a litigant