This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 19:05:21 (UTC).

COCHRAN, DONNIE L VS PAPP, IMORSEN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 COCHRAN, DONNIE L filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAPP, IMORSEN. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COCHRAN, DONNIE L

Defendant

PAPP, IMORSEN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION; Book: 5432; Page: 2286

03/04/2020: STIPULATION; Book: 5432; Page: 2286

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAPP, IMORSEN; PAPP, IMORSEN LCSO

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAPP, IMORSEN; PAPP, IMORSEN LCSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; Text: DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; Text: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STIPULATION; Book: 5432; Page: 2286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Text: PLTF PRESENT / DEFT PRESENT STIP TO BE ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO PAPP, IMORSEN / 02/05/2020; Text: PAPP, IMORSEN 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 310.0; Amount Paid: 310.0; Due Date: 2020-01-31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAPP, IMORSEN; Text: PAPP, IMORSEN LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 3/4/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 3/4/2020 9:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 2532847, FULLY PAID; Text: $310.00 2532847 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less