This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/20/2023 at 17:15:25 (UTC).

CIPILEWSKI, BERNADETTE Et Al VS DEHOYOS, PABLO Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CIPILEWSKI, BERNADETTE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEHOYOS, PABLO. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURINGTON, EMILY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURINGTON, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CIPILEWSKI, BERNADETTE

SPILLWAY PARK LLC

Defendants

DEHOYOS, PABLO

WILLIAMS, MELANEY

 

Court Documents

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2708110, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2708110 Fully Paid

01/21/2022: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2708110, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2708110 Fully Paid

CHECK LIST

01/21/2022: CHECK LIST

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT; FOR EVICTION

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT; FOR EVICTION

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, MELANEY; WILLIAMS, MELANEY

01/21/2022: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, MELANEY; WILLIAMS, MELANEY

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEHOYOS, PABLO; DEHOYOS, PABLO

01/21/2022: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEHOYOS, PABLO; DEHOYOS, PABLO

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/21/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEHOYOS, PABLO / 01/24/2022; DEHOYOS, PABLO 01/24/2022

01/25/2022: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEHOYOS, PABLO / 01/24/2022; DEHOYOS, PABLO 01/24/2022

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO WILLIAMS, MELANEY / 01/24/2022; WILLIAMS, MELANEY 01/24/2022

01/25/2022: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO WILLIAMS, MELANEY / 01/24/2022; WILLIAMS, MELANEY 01/24/2022

ORDER; 07/21/22

07/25/2022: ORDER; 07/21/22

MAIL RETURNED; / DEFTS' COPY OF ORDER DATED 072122

08/23/2022: MAIL RETURNED; / DEFTS' COPY OF ORDER DATED 072122

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 6027; Page: 244

09/20/2022: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 6027; Page: 244

 

Docket Entries

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Book: 6027; Page: 244

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022

HearingEvent Type: STC - STATUS CONFERENCE (SC/CC); Location: TAVARES; Room: EC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MAIL RETURNED; Text: / DEFTS' COPY OF ORDER DATED 072122

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022

DocketDescription: SET ON STC - STATUS CONFERENCE (SC/CC) DOCKET 08/30/2022 BEGINNING AT 2:30 PM; Text: STC - STATUS CONFERENCE (SC/CC) 08/30/2022 2:30 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: 07/21/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO WILLIAMS, MELANEY / 01/24/2022; Text: WILLIAMS, MELANEY 01/24/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEHOYOS, PABLO / 01/24/2022; Text: DEHOYOS, PABLO 01/24/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 205.0; Amount Paid: 205.0; Due Date: 2022-01-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEHOYOS, PABLO; Text: DEHOYOS, PABLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, MELANEY; Text: WILLIAMS, MELANEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: FOR EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2708110, FULLY PAID; Text: $205.00 2708110 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less