This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/14/2020 at 01:57:44 (UTC).

CHERY, MALHERBE VS LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 CHERY, MALHERBE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERY, MALHERBE

Defendant

LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $2,585.00; Book: 5374; Page: 224

11/14/2019 FINAL JUDGMENT; AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $2,585.00; Book: 5374; Page: 224

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL,; LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL,

09/30/2019 SUMMONS ISSUED TO LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL,; LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL,

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 0.18; Amount Paid: 0.18; Due Date: 2020-03-04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialDescription: CI - Lake - County Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: 5.0; Amount Paid: 5.0; Due Date: 2020-03-04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $5.18 ON RECEIPT 2543552, FULLY PAID; Text: $5.18 2543552 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT / $2,585.00; Book: 5374; Page: 224

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO; Text: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: (MEDIATION); Text: PLTF PRESENT / DEFT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / CLERK TO PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL, / 10/02/2019; Text: LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL, 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2019-09-30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL,; Text: LAKE COUNTY AUTO MALL,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 11/6/2019 BEGINNING AT 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 11/6/2019 10:30 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 2496677, FULLY PAID; Text: $185.00 2496677 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less