This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 11/21/2019 at 02:39:23 (UTC).

CENTRAL FLORIDA PRESTIGE PROPERTIES LLC Et Al VS ANARCHY INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2014 CENTRAL FLORIDA PRESTIGE PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANARCHY INC. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTRAL FLORIDA PRESTIGE PROPERTIES LLC

DEERING RENTALS LLC

Defendants

ANARCHY INC

UNKNOW PARTY IN POSSESSION

JENCIC, NYKII

JENCIC, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONANO, ALEXZANDER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

04/10/2014 SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO ANARCHY INC, A FLORIDA DISSOLVED CORPORATION D/B/A/ GEARS OF WAR PAINTBALL

04/10/2014 SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO ANARCHY INC, A FLORIDA DISSOLVED CORPORATION D/B/A/ GEARS OF WAR PAINTBALL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO NYKII JENCIC

04/10/2014 SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO NYKII JENCIC

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO ROBERT JENCIC

04/10/2014 SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO ROBERT JENCIC

COMPLAINT; COMPLAINT // EVICTION WITH EXHIBITS COUNT I - POSSESSION

04/10/2014 COMPLAINT; COMPLAINT // EVICTION WITH EXHIBITS COUNT I - POSSESSION

5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANARCHY INC AND SENT TO SCANNING

04/14/2014 5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANARCHY INC AND SENT TO SCANNING

5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NYKII JENCIC AND SENT TO SCANNING

04/14/2014 5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NYKII JENCIC AND SENT TO SCANNING

5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROBERT JENCIC AND SENT TO SCANNING

04/14/2014 5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROBERT JENCIC AND SENT TO SCANNING

5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION AND SENT TO SCANNING

04/14/2014 5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION AND SENT TO SCANNING

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO ; NOTICE OF 120 DAY DISMISSAL AS TO ROBERT JENCIC, NYKII JENCIC, ANARCHY INC., AND UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

08/25/2014 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO ; NOTICE OF 120 DAY DISMISSAL AS TO ROBERT JENCIC, NYKII JENCIC, ANARCHY INC., AND UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PETITION; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND RECORDED

09/03/2014 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PETITION; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND RECORDED

 

Docket Entries

09/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PETITION; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO ; NOTICE OF 120 DAY DISMISSAL AS TO ROBERT JENCIC, NYKII JENCIC, ANARCHY INC., AND UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2014
View Court Documents

Docket5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION AND SENT TO SCANNING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2014
View Court Documents

Docket5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROBERT JENCIC AND SENT TO SCANNING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2014
View Court Documents

Docket5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NYKII JENCIC AND SENT TO SCANNING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2014
View Court Documents

Docket5 DAY TE SUMMONS ISS TO AND DELIVERED TO; 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANARCHY INC AND SENT TO SCANNING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; COMPLAINT // EVICTION WITH EXHIBITS COUNT I - POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO ROBERT JENCIC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO NYKII JENCIC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO ANARCHY INC, A FLORIDA DISSOLVED CORPORATION D/B/A/ GEARS OF WAR PAINTBALL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

DocketISSUING SUBPOENA / COUNTY CIVIL; ISSUING SUBPOENA / COUNTY CIVIL Receipt: 348711 Date: 04/10/2014

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

DocketISSUING SUMMONS / COUNTY CIVIL; ISSUING SUMMONS / COUNTY CIVIL Receipt: 348711 Date: 04/10/2014

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

DocketFILING FEE ASSESSED - TENANT EVICTION COUNTY CIVIL; FILING FEE ASSESSED - TENANT EVICTION COUNTY CIVIL Receipt: 348711 Date: 04/10/2014

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

FinancialConversion Fee; Amount Due: $233.0; Amount Paid: $233.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less