This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 05/08/2020 at 04:41:08 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS KIEHM, TIFFANIE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIEHM, TIFFANIE. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

KIEHM, TIFFANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, DERYL G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KIEHM, TIFFANIE; KIEHM, TIFFANIE

02/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO KIEHM, TIFFANIE; KIEHM, TIFFANIE

 

Docket Entries

04/17/2020

DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: REQUIRING DEFT TIFFANIE KIEHM TO COMPLETE AND RETURN FACT INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2020

DocketDescription: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: / $4,268.53; Book: 5457; Page: 1080

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: FOR ORDER REQUIRING DEFT TIFFANIE KIEHM TO COMPLETE AND RETURN FACT INFORMATION SHEET AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO KIEHM, TIFFANIE; Text: KIEHM, TIFFANIE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST; Text: , FEES AND/OR CHARGES, AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS, AND AFFIDAVIT OF PAYMENT, CREDITS AND/OR DEBITS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF FILING; Text: ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS / AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketDescription: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020

HearingEvent Type: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC); Location: CMS; Room: 3RD FLOOR OF THE NORTH WING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020

DocketDescription: OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Text: ATTY PRESENT FOR PLTF / DEFT NOT PRESENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED / ATTY TO SUBMIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020

DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO KIEHM, TIFFANIE / 02/08/2020; Text: KIEHM, TIFFANIE 02/08/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2020-02-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due: 300.0; Amount Paid: 300.0; Due Date: 2020-02-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO KIEHM, TIFFANIE; Text: KIEHM, TIFFANIE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketDescription: SET ON JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) DOCKET 3/11/2020 BEGINNING AT 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: JCW - MEDIATION (SC/CC) 3/11/2020 11:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketDescription: PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 2534988, FULLY PAID; Text: $310.00 2534988 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less