This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/27/2023 at 08:45:19 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA VS FIGUEROA, GERMAN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FIGUEROA, GERMAN. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendant

FIGUEROA, GERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON S

7765 Sw 87 Avenue Suite 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM; /COMPLAINT

01/13/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; /COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/13/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 2798263, FULLY PAID; $185.00 2798263 Fully Paid

01/13/2023: PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 2798263, FULLY PAID; $185.00 2798263 Fully Paid

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FIGUEROA, GERMAN; FIGUEROA, GERMAN

01/13/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO FIGUEROA, GERMAN; FIGUEROA, GERMAN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO FIGUEROA, GERMAN / 01/20/2023; FIGUEROA, GERMAN 01/20/2023

01/20/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO FIGUEROA, GERMAN / 01/20/2023; FIGUEROA, GERMAN 01/20/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: PRELIMINARY SC PRETRIAL; Location: 1A; Room: COURTROOM 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO FIGUEROA, GERMAN / 01/20/2023; Text: FIGUEROA, GERMAN 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-01-13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim >$500 to $2500; Amount Due: 175.0; Amount Paid: 175.0; Due Date: 2023-01-13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO FIGUEROA, GERMAN; Text: FIGUEROA, GERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PRELIMINARY SC PRETRIAL DOCKET 2/15/2023 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),; Text: PRELIMINARY SC PRETRIAL 2/15/2023 9:00 AM MEDIATOR (SMALL CLAIMS),

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 2798263, FULLY PAID; Text: $185.00 2798263 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Text: /COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less