This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 10/03/2023 at 09:01:21 (UTC).

BUZZELL, PAMELA VS LANGSTON, HOLLY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 BUZZELL, PAMELA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LANGSTON, HOLLY. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUZZELL, PAMELA

Defendants

LANGSTON, HOLLY

WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY, JERRON

 

Court Documents

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LANGSTON, HOLLY; LANGSTON, HOLLY

09/06/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LANGSTON, HOLLY; LANGSTON, HOLLY

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

09/06/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2866898, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2866898 Fully Paid

09/06/2023: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2866898, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2866898 Fully Paid

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/05/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/05/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT; EVICTION

09/05/2023: COMPLAINT; EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/05/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/28/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FINAL JUDGMENT; AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION; Book: 6217; Page: 1466

09/27/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT; AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION; Book: 6217; Page: 1466

COVER LETTER DATED; 092223 FILING PROPOSED FJ

09/27/2023: COVER LETTER DATED; 092223 FILING PROPOSED FJ

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

09/21/2023: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT

09/20/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; FOR EVICTION

09/20/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; FOR EVICTION

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

09/20/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY; LANGSTON, HOLLY

09/20/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY; LANGSTON, HOLLY

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY / 09/08/2023; LANGSTON, HOLLY 09/08/2023

09/20/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY / 09/08/2023; LANGSTON, HOLLY 09/08/2023

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER / 09/08/2023; WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER 09/08/2023

09/20/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER / 09/08/2023; WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER 09/08/2023

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

09/14/2023: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION; Book: 6217; Page: 1466

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: 092223 FILING PROPOSED FJ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; Text: LANGSTON, HOLLY,WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: FOR EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; Text: WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY; Text: LANGSTON, HOLLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO LANGSTON, HOLLY / 09/08/2023; Text: LANGSTON, HOLLY 09/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER / 09/08/2023; Text: WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER 09/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2023-09-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LANGSTON, HOLLY; Text: LANGSTON, HOLLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER; Text: WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2866898, FULLY PAID; Text: $205.00 2866898 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less