This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 10/13/2023 at 09:01:50 (UTC).

WESTDALE ASSET MANAGEMENTAS MANAGER FOR SUNDANCE APTS VS BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 WESTDALE ASSET MANAGEMENTAS MANAGER FOR SUNDANCE APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTDALE ASSET MANAGEMENTAS MANAGER FOR SUNDANCE APTS

Defendants

SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA

BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING SR, DALE G

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT; EVICTION

09/15/2023: COMPLAINT; EVICTION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/15/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/15/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2869771, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2869771 Fully Paid

09/15/2023: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2869771, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2869771 Fully Paid

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA; SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA

09/15/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA; SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY; BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY

09/15/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY; BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/22/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA / 09/26/2023; SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA 09/26/2023

09/28/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA / 09/26/2023; SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA 09/26/2023

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY / 09/26/2023; BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY 09/26/2023

09/28/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY / 09/26/2023; BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY 09/26/2023

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Book: 6219; Page: 1355

09/29/2023: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Book: 6219; Page: 1355

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Book: 6219; Page: 1355

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY / 09/26/2023; Text: BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY 09/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA / 09/26/2023; Text: SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA 09/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2023-09-15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY; Text: BENTANCOURT AKA LEROY BETANCOURT, LEROY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA; Text: SMITH AKA RITA B SMITH, RITA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2869771, FULLY PAID; Text: $205.00 2869771 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less