This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 10/31/2019 at 14:22:42 (UTC).

PALM PORTFOLIO LLC C/O PARENT CO VS ROBINSON JR, ELIJAH

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 PALM PORTFOLIO LLC C/O PARENT CO filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ROBINSON JR, ELIJAH. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEAL, TERRY T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEAL, TERRY T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALM PORTFOLIO LLC C/O PARENT CO

Defendant

ROBINSON JR, ELIJAH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/28/2016

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2016

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; LCSO - AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2016

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RESIDENTIAL - COUNT I; // SIGNED 01.19.16; Book: 4730; Page: 2223

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2016

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION - COUNT I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2016

DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION - COUNT I/ DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ROBINSON, ELIJAH JR; ROBINSON, ELIJAH JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2016

Docket5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO ROBINSON, ELIJAH JR / 12/31/2015; ROBINSON, ELIJAH JR 12/31/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2015

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2015

Docket5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBINSON, ELIJAH JR AND DELIVERED TO LCSO PU BOX; ROBINSON, ELIJAH JR LCSO PU BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2015

DocketCHECK LIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2015

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2015

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2015

DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 2099628, FULLY PAID; $195.00 2099628 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2015

FinancialLake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $195.0; Amount Paid: $195.0; Due Date: 2015-12-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less