This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/15/2023 at 08:57:03 (UTC).

MITCHELL, GREGORY VS CLUB EXPLORIA LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 MITCHELL, GREGORY filed an Other lawsuit against CLUB EXPLORIA LLC. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSLEY, DAN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSLEY, DAN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL, GREGORY

Defendants

CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC

CLUB EXPLORIA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEACOX, ZACHARY A

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/05/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/05/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

INTERROGATORIES

05/05/2023: INTERROGATORIES

INTERROGATORIES

05/05/2023: INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/05/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/05/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC,; CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC,

04/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC,; CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLUB EXPLORIA LLC,; CLUB EXPLORIA LLC,

04/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLUB EXPLORIA LLC,; CLUB EXPLORIA LLC,

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 2829634, FULLY PAID; $20.00 2829634 Fully Paid

04/28/2023: PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 2829634, FULLY PAID; $20.00 2829634 Fully Paid

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-04-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-04-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC,; Text: CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLUB EXPLORIA LLC,; Text: CLUB EXPLORIA LLC,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Filing Fee; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2023-03-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2817268, FULLY PAID; Text: $400.00 2817268 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: JURY TRIAL DEMAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less