This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/15/2023 at 13:57:20 (UTC).

CASTIGLIA, JONATHAN VS SOCIAL FINANCE INC

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 CASTIGLIA, JONATHAN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SOCIAL FINANCE INC. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAKAC, MICHAEL G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAKAC, MICHAEL G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTIGLIA, JONATHAN

Defendant

SOCIAL FINANCE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIRALDO, MANUEL S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/05/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMAND // CLASS ACTION SUIT

04/05/2023: COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMAND // CLASS ACTION SUIT

MOTION; FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

04/05/2023: MOTION; FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

04/05/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2822849, FULLY PAID; $410.00 2822849 Fully Paid

04/05/2023: PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2822849, FULLY PAID; $410.00 2822849 Fully Paid

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOCIAL FINANCE INC,; SOCIAL FINANCE INC,

04/05/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOCIAL FINANCE INC,; SOCIAL FINANCE INC,

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SOCIAL FINANCE INC, / 04/06/2023; SOCIAL FINANCE INC, 04/06/2023

04/12/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SOCIAL FINANCE INC, / 04/06/2023; SOCIAL FINANCE INC, 04/06/2023

NOTICE OF REMOVAL; DEFENDANTT'S NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Book: 6138; Page: 876

05/05/2023: NOTICE OF REMOVAL; DEFENDANTT'S NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Book: 6138; Page: 876

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Text: DEFENDANTT'S NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Book: 6138; Page: 876

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SOCIAL FINANCE INC, / 04/06/2023; Text: SOCIAL FINANCE INC, 04/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-04-05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Filing Fee; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2023-04-05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOCIAL FINANCE INC,; Text: SOCIAL FINANCE INC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2822849, FULLY PAID; Text: $410.00 2822849 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: JURY TRIAL DEMAND // CLASS ACTION SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less