This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 09/12/2023 at 09:04:22 (UTC).

BRIGHT, BETTY EVANS, BRIGHT, LISA ANNE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 BRIGHT, BETTY EVANS, BRIGHT, LISA ANNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRIGHT, LISA ANNE

Decedents

BRIGHT, BETTY EVANS

BRIGHT, BETTY E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWIGERT, BRETT L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2023

DocketDescription: DISMISSED, SETTLED OR DISPOSED BEFORE HEARING; Text: Dismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketDescription: REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SWIGERT, BRETT L.; Text: REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SWIGERT, BRETT L.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketDescription: PETITIONER: BRIGHT, LISA ANNE; Text: Petitioner: BRIGHT, LISA ANNE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketDescription: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Book: 6201; Page: 1882

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketDescription: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD - REAL PROPERTY; Book: 6201; Page: 1876

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketDescription: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE; Book: 6201; Page: 1875

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketDescription: PROOF OF SERVICE; Text: OF FORMAL NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED; Text: SELF PROVEN; Book: 6201; Page: 1877

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - Probate Summary Administration <$1000; Amount Due: 235.0; Amount Paid: 235.0; Due Date: 2023-08-16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketDescription: PAID $235.00 ON RECEIPT 2861432, FULLY PAID; Text: $235.00 2861432 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: CHECKLIST FOR DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: CHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: FORMAL NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Text: AND DETERMINATION OF HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less