This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/15/2023 at 08:43:51 (UTC).

NEGRON, ANGEL VS GOKEY, BRIAN LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2023 NEGRON, ANGEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOKEY, BRIAN LEE. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAKAC, MICHAEL G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAKAC, MICHAEL G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEGRON, ANGEL

Defendants

GOKEY, BRIAN LEE

MOELLER TRUCKING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANDEVAR, MONICA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT; // JURY DEMAND

03/19/2023: COMPLAINT; // JURY DEMAND

PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2816753, FULLY PAID; $400.00 2816753 Fully Paid

03/21/2023: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2816753, FULLY PAID; $400.00 2816753 Fully Paid

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

04/11/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

04/21/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

04/21/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 2827571, FULLY PAID; $20.00 2827571 Fully Paid

04/21/2023: PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 2827571, FULLY PAID; $20.00 2827571 Fully Paid

SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOKEY, BRIAN LEE; GOKEY, BRIAN LEE

04/21/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOKEY, BRIAN LEE; GOKEY, BRIAN LEE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MOELLER TRUCKING INC,; MOELLER TRUCKING INC,

04/21/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO MOELLER TRUCKING INC,; MOELLER TRUCKING INC,

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-04-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-04-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO MOELLER TRUCKING INC,; Text: MOELLER TRUCKING INC,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOKEY, BRIAN LEE; Text: GOKEY, BRIAN LEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 2827571, FULLY PAID; Text: $20.00 2827571 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Filing Fee; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2023-03-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2816753, FULLY PAID; Text: $400.00 2816753 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: // JURY DEMAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less