This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 05/15/2023 at 07:54:33 (UTC).

EDMISTON SR, RAY R, EDMISTON, KAREN E Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 EDMISTON SR, RAY R, EDMISTON, KAREN E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EDMISTON, KAREN E

Decedent

EDMISTON SR, RAY R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SOULSBY, EDWARD W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2022-36-A DATED APRIL 19, 2023; Text: SINGELTARY, G RICHARD SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 7, Per Admin Order L-2022-36-A dated April 19, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Probate Formal Administration; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2023-03-17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2815872, FULLY PAID; Text: $400.00 2815872 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less