This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 05/15/2023 at 09:40:34 (UTC).

CREASON, HELEN, FREEMAN, JUDY ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 CREASON, HELEN, FREEMAN, JUDY ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZ, LARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZ, LARRY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FREEMAN, JUDY ANN

Decedent

CREASON, HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SOULSBY, EDWARD W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED; Text: SELF PROVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Probate Formal Administration; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2023-03-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2818414, FULLY PAID; Text: $400.00 2818414 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less