This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 10/26/2023 at 09:22:11 (UTC).

EUDORA RESERVE LLC VS ALESHIRE, ANTHONY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 EUDORA RESERVE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALESHIRE, ANTHONY. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EUDORA RESERVE LLC

Defendants

GARCIA, ANAISA

ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, BARRY B

 

Court Documents

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

09/28/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARCIA, ANAISA; GARCIA, ANAISA

09/28/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARCIA, ANAISA; GARCIA, ANAISA

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2873212, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2873212 Fully Paid

09/28/2023: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2873212, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2873212 Fully Paid

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

09/28/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/28/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/28/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT; EVICTION

09/28/2023: COMPLAINT; EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ERECORDED DOCUMENT - ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; Book: 6231; Page: 1456

10/24/2023: ERECORDED DOCUMENT - ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; Book: 6231; Page: 1456

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

10/24/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND CLOSING CASE; Book: 6231; Page: 1456

10/24/2023: ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND CLOSING CASE; Book: 6231; Page: 1456

COVER LETTER DATED; 102323 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

10/24/2023: COVER LETTER DATED; 102323 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

STIPULATION; AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/23/2023: STIPULATION; AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

10/23/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

PROPOSED DEFAULT

10/20/2023: PROPOSED DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/20/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO ALESHIRE, ANTHONY / 10/07/2023; ALESHIRE, ANTHONY 10/07/2023

10/09/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO ALESHIRE, ANTHONY / 10/07/2023; ALESHIRE, ANTHONY 10/07/2023

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA / 10/07/2023; GARCIA, ANAISA 10/07/2023

10/09/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA / 10/07/2023; GARCIA, ANAISA 10/07/2023

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ERECORDED DOCUMENT - ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; Text: ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; Book: 6231; Page: 1456

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER BOOK 6231 PAGE 1456-1456; Text: APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND CLOSING CASE; Book: 6231; Page: 1456

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: 102323 FILING PROPOSED ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: STIPULATION; Text: AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; Text: GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PROPOSED DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO ALESHIRE, ANTHONY / 10/07/2023; Text: ALESHIRE, ANTHONY 10/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA / 10/07/2023; Text: GARCIA, ANAISA 10/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/28/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2023-09-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; Text: ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARCIA, ANAISA; Text: GARCIA, ANAISA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2873212, FULLY PAID; Text: $205.00 2873212 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY; Text: GARCIA, ANAISA,ALESHIRE, ANTHONY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less