This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 10/23/2023 at 09:15:38 (UTC).

FAWCETT, LORI N Et Al VS TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2023 FAWCETT, LORI N filed an Other lawsuit against TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FAWCETT, VERNON N

FAWCETT, LORI N

Defendant

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON, LEE

Defendant Attorney

TEMKIN, ELIZABETH S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/25/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING; PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

09/25/2023: NOTICE OF FILING; PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; TO DEFT.

09/25/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; TO DEFT.

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; TO DEFT.

09/25/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; TO DEFT.

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; TO DEFT.

09/25/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; TO DEFT.

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/25/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2872181, FULLY PAID; $410.00 2872181 Fully Paid

09/25/2023: PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2872181, FULLY PAID; $410.00 2872181 Fully Paid

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE,; TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE,

09/25/2023: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE,; TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE,

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FROM DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES AS TO TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE, / 09/27/2023; TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE, 09/27/2023

09/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FROM DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES AS TO TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE, / 09/27/2023; TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE, 09/27/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; / DIFFERENTIATED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/03/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; / DIFFERENTIATED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; OF ELIZABETH S. TEMKIN, ESQ FOR DEFT

10/17/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; OF ELIZABETH S. TEMKIN, ESQ FOR DEFT

MOTION; FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

10/17/2023: MOTION; FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Text: OF ELIZABETH S. TEMKIN, ESQ FOR DEFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Text: / DIFFERENTIATED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FROM DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES AS TO TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE, / 09/27/2023; Text: TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE, 09/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-25

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Claim $30,000.01 to $50,000.00; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2023-09-25

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE,; Text: TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2872181, FULLY PAID; Text: $410.00 2872181 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Text: TO DEFT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Text: TO DEFT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Text: TO DEFT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF FILING; Text: PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less