This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 10/03/2023 at 09:01:15 (UTC).

ACTIVATION INVESTMENT GROUP LLC VS SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 ACTIVATION INVESTMENT GROUP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAMETINI, LISA MARIE. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACTIVATION INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendant

SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY, JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/05/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT; EVICTION

09/05/2023: COMPLAINT; EVICTION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/05/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 2866924, FULLY PAID; $195.00 2866924 Fully Paid

09/06/2023: PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 2866924, FULLY PAID; $195.00 2866924 Fully Paid

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

09/06/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/12/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE / 09/08/2023; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE 09/08/2023

09/18/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE / 09/08/2023; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE 09/08/2023

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

09/18/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; FOR EVICTION

09/18/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; FOR EVICTION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT

09/18/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Book: 6213; Page: 355

09/19/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Book: 6213; Page: 355

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE CASE WAS DISMISSED

09/20/2023: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; SAMETINI, LISA MARIE CASE WAS DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; Text: SAMETINI, LISA MARIE CASE WAS DISMISSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Book: 6213; Page: 355

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Text: FOR EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; Text: SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE / 09/08/2023; Text: SAMETINI, LISA MARIE 09/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2023-09-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAMETINI, LISA MARIE; Text: SAMETINI, LISA MARIE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 2866924, FULLY PAID; Text: $195.00 2866924 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less