This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/20/2023 at 09:03:15 (UTC).

CITIZENS BANK N A VS BANK OF AMERICA N A SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 CITIZENS BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA N A SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIZENS BANK N A

Defendants

FITZGERALD, MICHAEL E

BANK OF AMERICA N A SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC

WOODRIDGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

WOODRIDGE PHASE ONE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

FITZGERALD UNKNOWN SPOUSE, MICHAEL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

Defendant Attorney

CUMMINGS, KERRY A

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FITZGERALD UNKNOWN SPOUSE, MICHAEL E; FITZGERALD UNKNOWN SPOUSE, MICHAEL E

05/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO FITZGERALD UNKNOWN SPOUSE, MICHAEL E; FITZGERALD UNKNOWN SPOUSE, MICHAEL E

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,

05/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,

05/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WOODRIDGE PHASE ONE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,; WOODRIDGE PHASE ONE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,

05/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO WOODRIDGE PHASE ONE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,; WOODRIDGE PHASE ONE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WOODRIDGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC,; WOODRIDGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC,

05/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO WOODRIDGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC,; WOODRIDGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BANK OF AMERICA N A SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC,; BANK OF AMERICA N A SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC,

05/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO BANK OF AMERICA N A SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC,; BANK OF AMERICA N A SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FITZGERALD, MICHAEL E; FITZGERALD, MICHAEL E

05/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED TO FITZGERALD, MICHAEL E; FITZGERALD, MICHAEL E

PAID $989.00 ON RECEIPT 2836941, FULLY PAID; $989.00 2836941 Fully Paid

05/24/2023: PAID $989.00 ON RECEIPT 2836941, FULLY PAID; $989.00 2836941 Fully Paid

NOTICE OF FILING; CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION // ATTACHED

05/23/2023: NOTICE OF FILING; CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION // ATTACHED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Text: KERRY A. CUMMINGS, ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA SBM COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Traffic Overage Fee; Amount Paid: 2.0; Due Date: 2023-06-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Traffic Refund under $10.00; Due Date: 2023-06-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $987.00 ON RECEIPT 2836941, FULLY PAID; Text: $987.00 2836941 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: REVISED, RECEIPT NUMBER 2836941; Text: 2836941

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-05-24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-05-24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-05-24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-05-24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Book: 6148; Page: 243

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less