This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 10/13/2023 at 09:01:40 (UTC).

THE COVE AT LADY LAKE PARTNERS LTD DBA THE COVE AT LADY LAKE APARTMENTS VS GARRETT, CYNTHIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 THE COVE AT LADY LAKE PARTNERS LTD DBA THE COVE AT LADY LAKE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARRETT, CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEPPERMAN, CARLA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEPPERMAN, CARLA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE COVE AT LADY LAKE PARTNERS LTD DBA THE COVE AT LADY LAKE APARTMENTS

Defendants

GARRETT, CYNTHIA

GARRETT, JERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRON III, JAMES I

 

Court Documents

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARRETT, JERRY; GARRETT, JERRY

09/15/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARRETT, JERRY; GARRETT, JERRY

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARRETT, CYNTHIA; GARRETT, CYNTHIA

09/15/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARRETT, CYNTHIA; GARRETT, CYNTHIA

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2869779, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2869779 Fully Paid

09/15/2023: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2869779, FULLY PAID; $205.00 2869779 Fully Paid

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/15/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/15/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT; EVICTION

09/15/2023: COMPLAINT; EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/11/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; SCANNED

10/10/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; SCANNED

PROPOSED DOCUMENT; / WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/10/2023: PROPOSED DOCUMENT; / WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Book: 6223; Page: 2042

10/06/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Book: 6223; Page: 2042

ORDER; ENTERING DEFAULT

10/06/2023: ORDER; ENTERING DEFAULT

COVER LETTER DATED; 092923 FILING PROPOSED FJ

10/06/2023: COVER LETTER DATED; 092923 FILING PROPOSED FJ

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/01/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

10/01/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT; AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

10/01/2023: AFFIDAVIT; AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO GARRETT, CYNTHIA / 09/20/2023; GARRETT, CYNTHIA 09/20/2023

09/27/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO GARRETT, CYNTHIA / 09/20/2023; GARRETT, CYNTHIA 09/20/2023

5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO GARRETT, JERRY / 09/20/2023; GARRETT, JERRY 09/20/2023

09/27/2023: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO GARRETT, JERRY / 09/20/2023; GARRETT, JERRY 09/20/2023

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO; Text: SCANNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PROPOSED DOCUMENT; Text: / WRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Book: 6223; Page: 2042

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: ENTERING DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COVER LETTER DATED; Text: 092923 FILING PROPOSED FJ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT; Text: AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED AS TO GARRETT, CYNTHIA / 09/20/2023; Text: GARRETT, CYNTHIA 09/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2023-09-15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Lake - County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: 185.0; Amount Paid: 185.0; Due Date: 2023-09-15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARRETT, JERRY; Text: GARRETT, JERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: 5 DAY TENANT EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARRETT, CYNTHIA; Text: GARRETT, CYNTHIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 2869779, FULLY PAID; Text: $205.00 2869779 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT; Text: EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less